Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Anderson , Maurice filed a(n) case against St Johns , Garnetta, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts with Barbara T. Peebles presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
|
Judgment Entered
Date: January 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CASE TAXED |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Plaintiff appears or Attorney appears for plaintiff. Defendant appears not. Default Judgment against defendant in the amount of $2100.00 and possession of premises at 5610 PENNSYLVANIA AVE., ST.LOUIS, MO. 63111. Court Cost assessed against DEFENDANT. SO ORDERED: JUDGE BARBARA PEEPLES #36220 |
|
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 12/06/2013 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/10/2014; 9:30 AM ; BARBARA PEEBLES; City of St. Louis |
|
December 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-SMLT-6710; Served To - ST JOHNS, GARNETTA; Server - R KONSEWICZ SERVICE DEPUTY; Served Date - 13-DEC-13; Served Time - 14:30:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
December 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant Document ID: 13-SMLT-6710, for ST JOHNS, GARNETTA. |
|
December 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/10/2014 - Default Judgment \n Scheduled For: 01/10/2014; 9:30 AM ; BARBARA PEEBLES; City of St. Louis |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Pet Filed in Associate Ct |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.