Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Metroplex Management, Lc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Basler , Christopher William, against Stewart , Dimita, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with STOVALL-REID, CALEA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: June 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 16-GARN-6325 |
|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Release of Garnishment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM BASLER \n On Behalf Of: METROPLEX MANAGEMENT, LC |
|
May 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 16-GARN-6325; Served To - TOWER GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH; Server - J GALLI SERVICE DEPUTY; Served Date - 12-MAY-16; Served Time - 13:02:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - RUTH MENKE |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 16-GARN-6325 for DIMITA STEWART; returnable date: CONTINUOUS ; Garnishee: TOWER GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH |
|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Garnishment Paid to Attorney | |
April 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Garnishment Application; Interrogatories to Garnishee; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM BASLER \n On Behalf Of: METROPLEX MANAGEMENT, LC |
|
October 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 15-GARN-13984; Served To - TOWER GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH; Server - J GALLI SERVICE DEPUTY; Served Date - 15-OCT-15; Served Time - 13:01:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - RUTH MENKE/CHURCH FINANCE SEC |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Garnishment Application; Interrogatories to Garnishee; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: CHRISTOPHER WILLIAM BASLER \n On Behalf Of: METROPLEX MANAGEMENT, LC |
|
October 02, 2015 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 15-GARN-13984 for DIMITA STEWART; returnable date: 30-MAR-2016; Garnishee: TOWER GROVE BAPTIST CHURCH |
|
May 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed Garnishment/Execution Number 14-GARN-16278 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.