Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Master Finance Company Of Texas D B A Master Finance Corp., filed a(n) Promissory Note - Creditor case represented by Jacobs , Mitchell David, against Bogaty , Clifford, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis City, MO, . St. Louis City, MO Superior Courts MO-City of St. Louis with PEEBLES, BARBARA presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryAc Promissory Note |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSt. Louis City, MO |
Matter TypePromissory Note |
Filing Court HouseMO-City of St. Louis |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: January 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service return garnishment |
|
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 14-GARN-5164 for CLIFFORD BOGATY; returnable date: 10-SEP-2014; Garnishee: TOP CARE LAWN SERVICE INC |
|
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Clifford Bogaty Request for Garnishment. Filed By: MITCHELL DAVID JACOBS \n On Behalf Of: MASTER FINANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS D/B/A MASTER FINANCE CORP. |
|
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note CASE TAXED |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Plaintiff appears or with attorney and Defendant appears not. Default Judgment entered for plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $228.33. Plus Court Cost. SO ORDERED: JUDGE BARBARA PEEBLES #36220 |
|
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 12/06/2013 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/27/2014; 9:30 AM ; BARBARA PEEBLES; City of St. Louis |
|
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 13-ADSM-11784; Served To - BOGATY, CLIFFORD; Server - ; Served Date - 08-JAN-14; Served Time - 20:25:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 13-ADSM-11784, for BOGATY, CLIFFORD. |
|
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Associate Ct Clifford Bogaty Petition. Filed By: MITCHELL DAVID JACOBS \n On Behalf Of: MASTER FINANCE COMPANY OF TEXAS D/B/A MASTER FINANCE CORP. |
|
December 06, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/27/2014 - Default Judgment \n Scheduled For: 01/27/2014; 9:30 AM ; BARBARA PEEBLES; City of St. Louis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.