Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jones , Paula, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dreesen , Duane Mathew Ii, against Georgian Gardens, Georgian Gardens Center For Rehab And Healthcare, Georgian Gardens Healthcare, Llc, Georgian Gardens Opco, Llc, Georgian Gardens Operations Management Llc, (total of 8) See All represented by Estopare , Thomas J, Willman , Philip Louis, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO, . Washington County, MO Superior Courts MO-Washington with WEXLER HORN, WENDY LYNN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWEXLER HORN, WENDY LYNN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2021 |
CategoryCc Wrongful Death |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationWashington County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseMO-Washington |
Case Outcome TypeChange Of Venue |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
January 23, 2023 | Hearing | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
January 23, 2023 | Hearing | Motion Hearing Held | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Change of Venue | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Change of Venue | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation Filed | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Filed | |
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Family Member/Roommate Served | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.