Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc - Omaha, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mitchell , Jason Roger, against Wilson , Robert L, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO, . Washington County, MO Superior Courts MO-Washington with HYDE, TROY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHYDE, TROY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2021 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWashington County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Washington |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum Filed | |
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Memorandum Filed | |
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Memorandum Filed | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Certification Filed | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Lien Request Filed | |
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Lien Request Filed REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT. Filed By: JASON ROGER MITCHELL \n On Behalf Of: LVNV FUNDING LLC - OMAHA |
|
March 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certification Filed CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.