Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Corp Solutions Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heiliger , Jordan Marie, against Davis , Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO, . Washington County, MO Superior Courts MO-Washington with HYDE, TROY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHYDE, TROY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 17, 2020 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationWashington County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Washington |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 08/14/2020 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 08/14/2020 - Case Review Scheduled In response to the Coronavirus disease pandemic, the Presiding Judge in the 24th Judicial Circuit Court has ordered in-person court proceedings be continued. Accordingly, this cause is continue to November 4th, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. for announcement. So Ordered. \n Scheduled For: 11/04/2020; 9:00 AM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
|
August 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal DISMISSAL. Filed By: JORDAN MARIE HEILIGER \n On Behalf Of: CREDIT CORP SOLUTIONS INC |
|
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled In response to the Coronavirus disease pandemic, the Presiding Judge in the 24th Judicial Circuit Court has ordered in-person court proceedings be continued. Accordingly, this cause is continue to November 4th, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. for announcement. So Ordered. Associated Entries: 08/25/2020 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice \n Scheduled For: 11/04/2020; 9:00 AM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
|
August 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 08/19/2020; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/14/2020 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/19/2020; 9:00 AM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
|
July 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled CAUSE CONTINUED TO AUGUST 19TH 2020 AT 9;00 .AM. AT TELEPHONE REQUEST OF DEFENDANT. (SICK) Hearing Continued From: 07/15/2020; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
June 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 20-ADSM-999; Served To - DAVIS, KELLY; Server - SO WASHINGTON CNTY-POTOSI; Served Date - 16-JUN-20; Served Time - 09:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 20-ADSM-999, for DAVIS, KELLY. |
|
April 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.