Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Atwood Rentals Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Burnett , Ronald S, against Stivers , Jerry, Stivers , Samantha, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO, . Washington County, MO Superior Courts MO-Washington with HYDE, TROY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHYDE, TROY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2018 |
CategoryAc Replevin |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationWashington County, MO |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseMO-Washington |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order Filed | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 05/17/2018 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 05/17/2018 - Court Trial Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/01/2018; 1:00 PM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Filed Order for Dimissal without Prejudice. Filed By: RONALD S BURNETT \n On Behalf Of: ATWOOD RENTALS INC. |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Motion for Dismissal without Prejudice. Filed By: RONALD S BURNETT \n On Behalf Of: ATWOOD RENTALS INC. |
|
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing Continued/Rescheduled | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 17, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 06/20/2018; 9:00 AM Civil Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.