Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Inc. , Watsons, filed a(n) case against Declue , Mathew, in the jurisdiction of Washington County, MO, . Washington County, MO Superior Courts with HYDE, TROY KEITH presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHYDE, TROY KEITH Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationWashington County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment. |
|
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
October 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
May 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 15-GARN-965; Served To - SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO; Server - ; Served Date - 06-MAY-15; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
April 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 15-GARN-965 for MATHEW DECLUE; returnable date: 13-OCT-2015; Garnishee: SEARS ROEBUCK AND CO |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Request for Garnishment. |
|
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Interrogatories Filed | |
April 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Affidavit Filed | |
December 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 10/10/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 10/10/2013 - Court Trial Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/04/2013; 2:00 PM ; TROY KEITH HYDE; Washington |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.