Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Brown , Toni filed a(n) Pr Small Est Affidavit W/Will case in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County. This case was filed in Stoddard County Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryPr Small Est Affidavit W/Will |
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeProbate Judmt Final Dist |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate of Clerk | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Judmt Final Dist | |
December 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affd-Publctn of Notice to Cred Filed By: ROBIN PHELAN NORTHERN \n On Behalf Of: ANITA COURINGTON |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Cert/Ord Probt L/Will Testmnt | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Last Will and Testament | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Bond Waived | |
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notc to Creditor-Small Estate faxed to the Bernie Banner. |
|
December 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Ord Admit Will | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Filed E-mails regarding heirs. |
|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Efiled Copy L/Will Testament Filed By: ROBIN PHELAN NORTHERN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.