Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Page , David Joseph, against Kimbrough , Blake N, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 01, 2021 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: January 18, 2022Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Release Filed | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Release of Lien. Filed By: DAVID JOSEPH PAGE \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK \n Associated Entries: 01/18/2022 - Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court |
|
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Filed By: DAVID JOSEPH PAGE \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court Associated Entries: 03/07/2022 - Release Filed Release of Lien. |
|
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 12/01/2021 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/18/2022; 9:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.