Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lovett , Christopher T filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryCc Dissolution- W/ Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution Evidence adduced. The marriage of Petitioner and Respondent is dissolved. The Petitioner is granted sole legal and sole physical custody of the minor child as set forth in the Parenting Plan. All marital property and debt is divided as set forth in the Separation Agreement. See prepared Judgment. |
|
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Filed | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Uncont Dissolution Hrng Held Petitioner appeared in person without counsel. Testimony heard. Evidence adduced. Judgment to be prepared. Scheduled For: 11/03/2020; 11:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Uncont Dissolution Hrng Sched Associated Entries: 11/03/2020 - Uncont Dissolution Hrng Held Petitioner appeared in person without counsel. Testimony heard. Evidence adduced. Judgment to be prepared. \n Scheduled For: 11/03/2020; 11:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing | Notice of Court Hearing Sent | |
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comp-Litigant Awareness Filed Filed By: CHRISTOPHER T LOVETT |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comp-Litigant Awareness Filed Filed By: KATIE JANE LOVETT |
|
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confid Filing Info Sheet Filed Filed By: KATIE JANE LOVETT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.