Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Southeast Health Center Of Stoddard County, Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Walterbach , Scott Francis, against Bennett , Kristopher Eric, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2020 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: October 20, 2020Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: October 20, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Full Release of Garnishment | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Full Release of Garnishment Filed By: SCOTT FRANCIS WALTERBACH \n On Behalf Of: SOUTHEAST HEALTH CENTER OF STODDARD COUNTY, LLC |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed By garnishee Tyson Foods stating no longer employed 5/6/2021.ew |
|
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 20-GARN-913 |
|
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
January 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed Garnishment/Execution Number 20-GARN-913 By garnishee Tyson Foods stating $111.43 was withheld.ew |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Plaintiff certifies that on Thursday, January 14, 2021 within 5 days of service of garnishment, a copy of the summons, writ of garnishment and exemption notice were send regular mail to Judgment Debtor's last know address. sg Filed By: SCOTT FRANCIS WALTERBACH \n On Behalf Of: SOUTHEAST HEALTH CENTER OF STODDARD COUNTY, LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.