Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Battles , Jolene filed a(n) Ac Rent And Possession case in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with JARRELL, BRADLEY D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJARRELL, BRADLEY D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryAc Rent And Possession |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Judgment Entered
Date: September 29, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Return Service-Writ Served | |
October 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Service-Writ Served Document ID - 20-EXEC-20; Served To - LOVELESS, JAMES; Server - SO STODDARD COUNTY-BLOOMFIELD; Served Date - 17-OCT-20; Served Time - 12:07:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution/Garnishment | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution/Garnishment This is garnishment 20-EXEC-20 for JAMES LOVELESS; James & Julie Loveless 303 Barbara St Bloomfield, Mo 63825; returnable date: 19-OCT-2020 SCSD for service $45.35 check #1030.ew |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment also for possession of premises located at 303 Barbara Street Bloomfield, Mo 63825. |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Tried by Court-Civil | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Sound Recording Log Sheet | |
September 29, 2020 | Hearing | Hearing Held | |
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
September 29, 2020 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Both parties appear. Evidence adduced. Judge taken under advisement.ew Scheduled For: 09/29/2020; 9:00 AM ; BRADLEY D JARRELL; Stoddard |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.