Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Davis , Amy N, filed a(n) case against Davis , Bradford J, in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts with PREYER, H MARK presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePREYER, H MARK Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
July 29, 2021 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 08/26/2021; 1:00 PM ; H MARK PREYER; Stoddard |
|
June 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Joint Motion to Dismiss filed. Filed By: JOHN F SCOTT \n On Behalf Of: AMY N DAVIS |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Held By agreement of the parties case set for bench trial August 26, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. Scheduled For: 04/28/2021; 11:00 AM ; H MARK PREYER; Dunklin |
|
April 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/29/2021 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 08/26/2021; 1:00 PM ; H MARK PREYER; Stoddard |
|
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Available/Conflict Dates Filed Available dates filed by attorney for Respondent. Filed By: CAMERON BUNTING PARKER \n On Behalf Of: BRADFORD J DAVIS |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice filed by attorney for Respondent calling case up April 28, 2021, at 11:00 a.m., via conference call for purposes of a trial setting. (CALL IN INFORMATION ON NOTICE) Filed By: CAMERON BUNTING PARKER \n On Behalf Of: BRADFORD J DAVIS |
|
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 04/28/2021 - Trial Setting Held By agreement of the parties case set for bench trial August 26, 2021 at 1:00 p.m. \n Scheduled For: 04/28/2021; 11:00 AM ; H MARK PREYER; Dunklin |
|
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cert Serv of Interrog Filed by attorney for Respondent. Filed By: CAMERON BUNTING PARKER \n On Behalf Of: BRADFORD J DAVIS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.