Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Honda Finance Corporation, Citibank Na, City Of Puxico-City Hall, Credit First National Association, Hall , Mark Adams, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) Pr Supervised Without Will case in the jurisdiction of Stoddard County, MO, . Stoddard County, MO Superior Courts MO-Stoddard with MITCHELL, STEPHEN R presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2012 |
CategoryPr Supervised Without Will |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationStoddard County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Stoddard |
Case Outcome TypeProbate Ord Close File Dischrg |
Judgment Granting Ltrs of Adm
Date: October 04, 2012Order Appointing Pers Rep
Date: October 04, 2012Ord Appt Admr Ad Litem
Date: June 28, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Probate Ord Close File Dischrg | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ord of Discharge-Fiduciary Judgment/Order. |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Distributee of Robert Bryan Hall. Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Distributee of Mark Adams Hall. Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS \n On Behalf Of: MARK ADAMS HALL |
|
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Filed Proposed Order of Discharge. Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS \n On Behalf Of: ROBERT BRYAN HALL |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS |
|
July 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed Receipt of Distributee of Lori Beth Kiser. Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS \n On Behalf Of: LORI BETH KISER |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed Receipt of Distributee of Lindsey Hall. Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS \n On Behalf Of: ROBERT BRYAN HALL |
|
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed Receipt of Distributee of Melody Hall (formerly Doerring). Filed By: JENNIFER RENAE WILLIAMS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.