Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Terra Nova Insurance Co., filed a(n) Other Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) case represented by Rose, David Vinson, against F.W. Forbes & Co., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 25, 2005 |
CategoryOther Complaint (Not Spec) Unlimited (42) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Oct 4 2005 Type: 243410 - Dismissal: Other Court Ordered Manner : 241110 - Before Trial |
|
October 04, 2005 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Conference: Case Management 241110-Conference: Case Management; Terra Nova Insurance Co., et al. vs. F.W. Forbes & Co. ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
October 03, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
June 29, 2005 | Docket Event |
Answer/Response 212410-Answer Filed/Issued By: 911120 - Defendant Pro Per ANSWER [212410] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By DEFENDANT PRO PER [911120] |
|
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
Other DOCUMENTS PRIOR TO 5-17-2005 ; ; ; ; |
|
May 09, 2005 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
|
April 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
Complaint Filed 212210-Complaint Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.