Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pratt , Jesse Ray filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Shelby County, MO, . Shelby County, MO Superior Courts with GREENWELL, MIKE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREENWELL, MIKE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2012 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationShelby County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Term Ord of Protection Filed | |
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event | Motion to Term Order of Prot | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | Ord of Protection Served | |
September 20, 2013 | Hearing |
Adult Abuse Hearing Held Scheduled For: 09/20/2013; 9:00 AM ; MIKE GREENWELL; Shelby |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
JFULL Submitted Electronically Full Order was submitted for electronic processing |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judmt Full Order Protection ORDER EXTEDED 1 YEAR |
|
September 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/13/2013; 9:00 AM Adult Abuse Hearing |
|
September 13, 2013 | Hearing |
Adult Abuse Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 09/20/2013 - Adult Abuse Hearing Held \n Scheduled For: 09/20/2013; 9:00 AM ; MIKE GREENWELL; Shelby |
|
September 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Mot for Ext of Ord Protection | |
September 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Adult Abuse Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 09/13/2013 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 09/13/2013; 9:00 AM ; MIKE GREENWELL; Shelby |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.