Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Luntsford , Stephanie Michelle filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Shelby County, MO, . Shelby County, MO Superior Courts MO-Shelby with TUCKER, FREDERICK PAUL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTUCKER, FREDERICK PAUL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryCc Adult Abuse Stalking |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationShelby County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseMO-Shelby |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Ord of Protection Served | |
February 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
JFULL Submitted Electronically Full Order was submitted for electronic processing |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Judmt Full Order Protection | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Tried by Court-Civil | |
February 09, 2012 | Hearing |
Adult Abuse Hearing Held Scheduled For: 02/09/2012; 9:00 AM ; FREDERICK PAUL TUCKER; Shelby |
|
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Full Order of Protection | |
January 18, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 01/19/2012; 1:00 PM Adult Abuse Hearing |
|
January 18, 2012 | Hearing |
Adult Abuse Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 02/09/2012 - Adult Abuse Hearing Held \n Scheduled For: 02/09/2012; 9:00 AM ; FREDERICK PAUL TUCKER; Shelby |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Sched Hrng Submt Electronicaly SCAA Submitted Electronically and associates it to SCAA - Adult Abuse Hearing scheduled |
|
January 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order for Continuance MOTION TO CONTINUE GRANTED; EX PARTE ORDERS TO REMAIN IN EFFECT; HEARING FOR FULL ORDERS RESET FOR 2-9-12 AT 9:00 A.M. IN SHELBYVILLE. CLERK TO NOTIFY ATTORNEYS. RT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.