Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Equable Ascent Financial, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case against Kirby , Robert Eric, in the jurisdiction of Shelby County, MO, . Shelby County, MO Superior Courts MO-Shelby with GREENWELL, MIKE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGREENWELL, MIKE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationShelby County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Shelby |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: March 09, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event |
Assignment of Judgment Filed By: CHARLES L LITOW |
|
September 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 13-GARN-385; Served To - C-COM; Server - ; Served Date - 19-SEP-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
September 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 13-GARN-385 for ROBERT ERIC KIRBY; returnable date: 17-MAR-2014; Garnishee: C-COM |
|
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment Associated Entries: 01/13/2012 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 01/13/2012 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 03/09/2012; 1:00 PM ; MIKE GREENWELL; Shelby |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service PLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS, INTERROGATORIES , AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS Filed By: CHARLES L LITOW |
|
January 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 01/13/2012; 1:00 PM Hearing |
|
January 13, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/09/2012 - Default Judgment \n Scheduled For: 03/09/2012; 1:00 PM ; MIKE GREENWELL; Shelby |
|
December 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 11-ADSM-502; Served To - KIRBY, ROBERT ERIC; Server - ; Served Date - 17-DEC-11; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
December 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.