Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Washington , Jasmine Davonia filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with DONNELLY, MARGARET T. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2023 |
CategoryFc Dissolution- W/O Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Correspondence Sent | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Dissolution Filed Family | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Confid Dom Rel Info File Sheet | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Receipt Filed | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.