Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with CUNNINGHAM, HEATHER RENE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2023 |
CategoryFc Dissolution- W/ Children |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment on Dissolution | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Dissolution | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Note to Clerk eFiling |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.