Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Collector Of Revenue, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Moore , Robert C, against Busy Event Inc, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with DRAPER, JUDY PREDDY presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties CAUSE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SERVICE. Associated Entries: 12/12/2016 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/12/2017; 9:00 AM ; JUDY PREDDY DRAPER; St Louis County |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Dismiss without. Filed By: ROBERT C MOORE \n On Behalf Of: COLLECTOR OF REVENUE |
|
December 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 16-ADSM-23873; Served To - BUSY EVENT INC; Server - MARQUARD, MARGARET; Served Date - 22-DEC-16; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Territory 16; Reason Description - Moved; Service Text - VACANT |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 16-ADSM-23873, for BUSY EVENT INC.Summons Attached in PDF Form for Attorney to Retrieve from Secure Case.Net and Process for Service. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/17/2017 - Dismissed by Parties CAUSE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR LACK OF SERVICE. \n Scheduled For: 01/12/2017; 9:00 AM ; JUDY PREDDY DRAPER; St Louis County |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Judge Assigned DIVISION 41 THURSDAY |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed - No Fees Petition. On Behalf Of: COLLECTOR OF REVENUE |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: ROBERT C MOORE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.