Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case against Ballheimer , Brian Robert, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts with John N. Borbonus, III presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Ord Term Order of Protection SO ORDERED: JUDGE BORBONUS DIV 35 COPY HANDED TO PETITIONER, MAILED TO RESPONDENT AND FAXED TO ST LOUIS COUNTY PD |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained JUDGE BORBONUS DIV 35 |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION TO TERMINATE FULL ORDER OF PROTECTION Filed By: Petitioner |
|
December 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
OEXPA Submitted Electronically Ex Parte Order was submitted for electronic processing |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Judmt Full Order Protection Petitioner appears in person. Respondent appears, served. This order shall be effective until DECEMBER 19, 2014, unless sooner terminated or extended. ATTACHED PARENTING PLAN, FORM 14 Copy faxed to Police Department. Copy handed to PET & RES SO ORDERED: JUDGE JOHN N. BORBONUS Div. 35 ; Resp not to abuse stalk molest - YES; Resp not to communicate w/Petp - YES; Resp not to enter or stay - YES; Resp not to enter or stay - YES; Expiration Date - 19-DEC-2014 |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Associated Entries: 12/06/2013 - Adult Abuse Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/19/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN N. BORBONUS III; St Louis County |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Scheduled For: 12/19/2014; 8:30 AM ; JOHN N. BORBONUS III; St Louis County |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Full Order of Protection SO ORDERED: JUDGE JOHN N. BORBONUS |
|
December 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
JFULL Submitted Electronically Full Order was submitted for electronic processing |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
Ord of Protection Served Document ID - 13-AEOP-5645; Served To - BALLHEIMER, BRIAN ROBERT; Server - JEFFERSON COUNTY SHERIFFS DEPT; Served Date - 15-DEC-13; Served Time - 18:40:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.