Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Schuman Travel Associates, Inc, Damar Travel Incentives Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Shalowitz , Howard A., against Heimburger , John C Jr, Heimburger , Betty L, Travel Travel Kirkwood Inc, Ott , Patricia M, Prenzel , Brenda Sue, (total of 5) See All represented by West , Todd Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with WARNER, JOHN D JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryCc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note NO TAX |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties SO ORDERED: JUDGE JOHN D. WARNER JR. Associated Entries: 01/30/2017 - Counsel Status Hrng Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/20/2017; 8:30 AM ; JOHN D WARNER JR; St Louis County |
|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: HOWARD A. SHALOWITZ \n On Behalf Of: SCHUMAN TRAVEL ASSOCIATES, INC |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal dismissal w/ prejudice as to certain dfts only SO ORDERED: JUDGE JOHN D. WARNER JR. |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal as to Certain Defendants Only; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: HOWARD A. SHALOWITZ \n On Behalf Of: SCHUMAN TRAVEL ASSOCIATES, INC |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Suggestions in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Sanctions; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: STEPHEN A MARTIN \n On Behalf Of: BRENDA SUE PRENZEL, PATRICIA M OTT |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Conference Held Scheduled For: 01/30/2017; 9:00 AM ; JOHN D WARNER JR; St Louis County |
|
January 30, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 02/06/2017; 9:00 AM ; JOHN D WARNER JR; St Louis County |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Counsel Status Hrng Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/03/2018 - Dismissed by Parties SO ORDERED: JUDGE JOHN D. WARNER JR. \n Scheduled For: 12/20/2017; 8:30 AM ; JOHN D WARNER JR; St Louis County |
|
January 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiffs Section 490692 Notice of Intent to Use Business Records; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: HOWARD A. SHALOWITZ \n On Behalf Of: SCHUMAN TRAVEL ASSOCIATES, INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.