Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Union Electric Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Whealen , William Francis, against Bennett , Danielle, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with PERMUTER, LAWRENCE J JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: March 10, 2014Judgment Entered
Date: January 27, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard One Certified Copy of Judgment Prepared and Mailed to W. Whealen, Jr. Miller & Steeno, P.C. |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request for Records Filed Request for Certified Copy of Judgment. Filed By: WILLIAM FRANCIS WHEALEN \n On Behalf Of: UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, AMEREN MISSOURI |
|
January 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: WILLIAM FRANCIS WHEALEN |
|
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard One Certified Copy of Judgment Prepared and Mailed to W. Whealen, Jr. Miller & Steeno, P.C. |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Records Filed Request for Certified Copy of Judgment. Filed By: WILLIAM FRANCIS WHEALEN \n On Behalf Of: UNION ELECTRIC COMPANY, AMEREN MISSOURI |
|
November 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certif Copies/Leg File Prepard One Certified Copy of Judgment Prepared and |
|
October 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request for Records Filed REQUEST FOR CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT. Filed By: WILLIAM FRANCIS WHEALEN |
|
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court | |
March 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Req for Transcript Judgment | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER FEES TAXED AS COURT COST IN THE AMOUNT OF $40.00. NO STAY OF EXECUTION. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.