Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Aaron Rents Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gusdorf , Randall Eliot, against Wade , Sherry, in the jurisdiction of St. Louis County, MO, . St. Louis County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Louis County with PERMUTER, LAWRENCE J JR presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2013 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Louis County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Louis County |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE SO ORDERED: JUDGE LAWRENCE J. PERMUTER Associated Entries: 06/10/2014 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 06/10/2014 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/31/2014; 9:00 AM ; LAWRENCE J PERMUTER JR; St Louis County |
|
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal DWOPPC. Filed By: RANDALL ELIOT GUSDORF \n On Behalf Of: AARON RENTS INC |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: BRYAN ETHAN BRODY |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Affidavit of non est return; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: RANDALL ELIOT GUSDORF \n On Behalf Of: AARON RENTS INC |
|
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 14-AASM-4632; Served To - WADE, SHERRY; Server - ; Served Date - 11-JUL-14; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Non-est |
|
June 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/29/2014 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE SO ORDERED: JUDGE LAWRENCE J. PERMUTER \n Scheduled For: 07/31/2014; 9:00 AM ; LAWRENCE J PERMUTER JR; St Louis County |
|
June 10, 2014 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 06/12/2014; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
June 10, 2014 | Docket Event |
Alias Summons Issued Document ID: 14-AASM-4632, for WADE, SHERRY. Summons Attached in PDF Form for Attorney to Retrieve from Secure Case.Net and Process for Service. |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Summ Req-Assc Pers Serv Request for Appointment of Special Process Server Filed. Filed By: RANDALL ELIOT GUSDORF |
|
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: RANDALL ELIOT GUSDORF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.