Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mbengi , Fido M., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Manoka , Elie, in the jurisdiction of St. Charles County, MO, . St. Charles County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Charles Circuit Div with BURLISON, ERIN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 27, 2021 |
CategoryFc Dissolution- W/ Children |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSt. Charles County, MO |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Charles Circuit Div |
Case Outcome TypeUncontested |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Associated Entries: 03/09/2022 - Case Mgmt Conf Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 07/25/2022; 9:00 AM ; ERIN BURLISON; St Charles Circuit Div |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Dissolution FINAL CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. PC |
|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Dissolution JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE. THE MARRIAGE OF THE PARTIES IS HEREBY DISSOLVED. THERE IS ONE MINOR CHILD THAT WAS BORN OF THE MARRIAGE. MOTHER AND FATHER SHALL SHARE JOINT LEGAL AND JOINT PHYSICAL CUSTODY OF THE MINOR CHILD PURSUANT TO THE PARENTING PLAN ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT A. NEITHER PARTY SHALL PAY CHILD SUPPORT TO THE OTHER. THE PARTIES HAVE ENTERED INTO A MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ATTACHED HERETO AS EXHIBIT 3, WHICH IS FOUND TO BE NOT UNCONSCIONABLE. NEITHER PARTY IS ORDERED TO PAY MAINTENANCE TO THE OTHER AND SUCH ORDER IS NON-MODIFIABLE. THE PARTIES SHALL PAY THEIR OWN ATTORNEY'S FEES. COURT COSTS SHALL BE PAID FROM THE FILING FEE PREVIOUSLY DEPOSITED, PER EB. -SENT TO CHILD SUPPORT'S QUEUE FOR REVIEW. -CERTIFIED COPY OF JUDGMENT MAILED TO PETITIONER'S ATTORNEY AND PRO SE RESPONDENT ON 5/19/22. PC Filed By: ERIN BURLISON |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judmt/Dec Dis Filed Judgement for Dissolution; Parenting Plan Exhibit 2; Martial Separation Agreement Exhibit 3; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: NEVADA M SMITH \n On Behalf Of: FIDO M. MBENGI |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Form 14 Filed Form 14; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: NEVADA M SMITH \n On Behalf Of: FIDO M. MBENGI |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Petitioner Affidavit; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: NEVADA M SMITH |
|
May 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Filed Respondent Affidavit; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: NEVADA M SMITH |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Mgmt Conf Scheduled Associated Entries: 05/18/2022 - Uncontested \n Scheduled For: 07/25/2022; 9:00 AM ; ERIN BURLISON; St Charles Circuit Div |
|
March 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice DUE TO REASSIGNMENT, THIS CASE IS NOW SCHEDULED FOR A CMC ON JULY 25, 2022 AT 9 AM IN DIVISION 8. --NOTICE MAILED TO PRO SE RESPONDENT. PC |
|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order CAUSE ORDERED REASSIGNED TO DIVISION 8 AS PER PRESIDING JUDGE MICHAEL FAGRAS. PARTIES NOTIFIED AND ORDER SENT TO DIVISION 8. ALC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.