Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Iremco Inc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Osterholt , Thomas E Jr, against Brown , Kilaundra, in the jurisdiction of St. Charles County, MO, . St. Charles County, MO Superior Courts MO-St Charles Circuit Div with STEIMEL, NORMAN C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 03, 2017 |
CategoryAc Landlord Actions (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSt. Charles County, MO |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseMO-St Charles Circuit Div |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: December 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered CONSENT JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF PLAINTIFF(S) AND AGAINST DEFENDANT(S) IN THE AMOUNT OF $840.00 RENT, $160.00 ATTORNEY FEES, $1,000.00 TOTAL PLUS COURT COSTS AND POSSESSION OF PREMISES. SAID JUDGMENT TO BEAR INTEREST AT RATE OF 9.0% PER ANNUM. NCS Filed By: NORMAN C STEIMEL III |
|
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Associated Entries: 11/07/2017 - Civil Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/08/2017; 9:00 AM ; NORMAN C STEIMEL III; Setting: 1; St Charles Circuit Div |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Service | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Personally Served | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 17-SMLT-1691; Served To - BROWN, KILAUNDRA; Server - ROTH, LARRY; Served Date - 18-NOV-17; Served Time - 11:10:00; Service Type - Special Process Server; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - SERVED TO KILAUNDRA BROWN AE |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service return of service. Filed By: THOMAS E OSTERHOLT JR \n On Behalf Of: IREMCO INC |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Summons Issued-Landlord/Tenant | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Civil Setting Scheduled |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.