Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Heiliger , Jordan Marie, against Cockrum , Melissa, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with GROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: June 17, 2021Judgment Entered
Date: June 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Garnishment Returned Non-Est | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Execution/Garnish | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Garnishment Paid to Court | |
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Execution/Garnishment Issued | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Return on Garnishment/Execution Number 21-GARN-115 |
|
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed | |
December 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT BALANCE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JASON ROGER MITCHELL \n On Behalf Of: LVNV FUNDING LLC |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance Filed | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed ENTRY OF APPEARANCE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JASON ROGER MITCHELL \n On Behalf Of: LVNV FUNDING LLC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.