Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lovelace , Hayden Lars, against Durnell , Brian K, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with GROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2021 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing: Document ID - 21-FBUP-1; Served To - DURNELL, BRIAN K; Server - ; Served Date - 20-MAY-21; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Other; Reason Description - |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Dismissal Without Prejudice; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOHN BROCK ROWATT \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing: Document ID: 21-FBUP-1, for DURNELL, BRIAN K. |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Suggestions Filed Suggestions of Bankruptcy; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOHN MORGAN HENDERSON JR \n On Behalf Of: BRIAN K DURNELL |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Stay Entered Associated Entries: 03/24/2021 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/16/2021; 10:00 AM ; RAYMOND MICHAEL GROSS; Ozark |
|
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JOHN BROCK ROWATT \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notc of Term Limtd Apprnc Fild Filed By: KAREN ANNE BATES-CROUCH |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notc of Limtd Appearance Filed Limited Entry of Appearance; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: KAREN ANNE BATES-CROUCH \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
|
March 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service SERVICE CONFIRMATION. Filed By: HAYDEN LARS LOVELACE \n On Behalf Of: DISCOVER BANK |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.