Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Evans , Teresa Gail, filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case against Missouri Dept Of Social Services, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with GROSS, RAYMOND MICHAEL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2017 |
CategoryPr Guardianship - Minor |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeProbate Ord Close File Dischrg |
Judgment Appt Gar for Minor
Date: February 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Probate Ord Close File Dischrg | |
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Probate Ord Close File Dischrg Court reviews file. Ward is now 18 years old. No assets. File closed. RMG |
|
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Guardian Status Report Filing | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Court reviews Annual Report and approves same. RMG |
|
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Review Scheduled | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notc Guard Status Report | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Court reviews Annual Report and approves same. RMG |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Guardian Status Report Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.