Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Quick Cash Of Missouri, Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Caviness , Ashley, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with MACPHERSON, CYNTHIA ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2017 |
CategoryAc Small Claims Over $100 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Associated Entries: 04/19/2017 - Small Claims Hrng Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 06/14/2017; 10:00 AM ; CYNTHIA ANN MACPHERSON; Ozark |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 17-SMSC-21; Served To - CAVINESS, ASHLEY; Server - ; Served Date - 25-MAY-17; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Out of State Served; Reason Description - Non-est |
|
May 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice SUMMONS NON EST. PLAINTIFF TO REQUEST ADDITIONAL SERVICE OR DISMISSAL OF CASE BY JUNE 14, 2017 |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Pet Filed Small Claims | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued- Small Claims Document ID: 17-SMSC-21, for CAVINESS, ASHLEY. |
|
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
April 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hrng Scheduled Associated Entries: 06/14/2017 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice \n Scheduled For: 06/14/2017; 10:00 AM ; CYNTHIA ANN MACPHERSON; Ozark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.