Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Greenwell , David, Williams , Davida, filed a(n) case against Allred , Marta, Allred , Scott W, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with CARTER, R CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Dismissal Filed By: LEE JOHN VIOREL III \n On Behalf Of: DAVIDA WILLIAMS, DAVID GREENWELL |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed By: LEE JOHN VIOREL III |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Case dismissed without prejudice. Case complete. Filed By: R CRAIG CARTER |
|
January 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Associated Entries: 12/05/2018 - Motion Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 02/06/2019; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss. Filed By: GEORGE CHRYSLER FISHER JR. |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice. Filed By: GEORGE CHRYSLER FISHER JR. \n On Behalf Of: SCOTT W ALLRED, MARTA ALLRED |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Attorney Fisher appears. Attorneys Gross and Pointer's motions to withdraw sustained. 6 Feb 2019 for all pending motions. |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Notice of Entry (12-5-18 Order and Motion Hearing Scheduled) was forward to plaintiffs. |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/28/2019 - Dismissed by Parties \n Scheduled For: 02/06/2019; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
|
December 05, 2018 | Hearing |
Motion Hearing Held Scheduled For: 12/05/2018; 9:00 AM ; R CRAIG CARTER; Ozark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.