Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Missouri Dept Of Revenue, filed a(n) Liens - Creditor case against Degase , Jeffery Lee, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts MO-Ozark with CARTER, R CRAIG presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2013 |
CategoryCc Cert Of Lien-Dor Taxes |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
Matter TypeLiens |
Filing Court HouseMO-Ozark |
Case Outcome TypeOther Final Disposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Sub Counsel by Auto Script Michael Kisling enters his appearance as attorney of record for the Missouri Department of Revenue and substitutes his appearance for Desiree Vitale pursuant to correspondence dated December 20, 2017 to the Office of State Courts Administrator requesting the substitution. |
|
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Filed By: MISSOURI DEPT OF REVENUE |
|
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | DOR Tax Lien Filed | |
July 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Other Final Disposition | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
July 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.