Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cach Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Pankowski , Wally Joseph, against Dubois , Stacy Ray, represented by Oster , Jacqueline Paige, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with JACOBS, JOHN B JR presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJACOBS, JOHN B JR Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 22, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Associated Entries: 07/29/2013 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 08/28/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Filed DISMISSAL MEMORANDUM FILED Filed By: WALLY JOSEPH PANKOWSKI |
|
August 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Notc/Sugg of Bankruptcy Filed | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 13-AASM-60; Served To - DUBOIS, STACY RAY; Server - SO OZARK COUNTY - GAINESVILLE; Served Date - 30-JUL-13; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
July 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 08/14/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Request for Alias Summons Filed By: WALLY JOSEPH PANKOWSKI |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 13-AASM-60, for DUBOIS, STACY RAY. |
|
July 29, 2013 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 08/14/2013 - Dismissed by Parties \n Scheduled For: 08/28/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
|
July 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice TO COUNSEL WITH COURT DATE |
|
July 10, 2013 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/29/2013 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 08/14/2013; 9:00 AM ; JOHN B JACOBS JR; Ozark |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.