Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Blackburn , Jim J, Snell , Kathy L, Blackburn , Jack I, Blackburn , Bob O, filed a(n) case represented by Russo , John Otis, against Blackburn , Nancy L, Dees , Linda S, Hammond , Patricia May, represented by Pickett , Sean W, in the jurisdiction of Ozark County, MO, . Ozark County, MO Superior Courts with MOODY, JOHN G presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2009 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationOzark County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Written request for specific distribution amounts with corresponding distributees forwarded to plaintiffs' attorney on 10-23-12. Having received no response; proceeds of Sheriff's Sale in the amount of $3,000.00 paid over to plaintiffs' attorney, John Russo. Check No. 4182. |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Judgment and Order signed by Judge John Moody filed. See said Judgment for more information. |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Other Final Disposition Associated Entries: 09/05/2012 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 09/05/2012 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 10/03/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
October 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Filing: Sheriff's Report of Sale filed. |
|
September 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the docket entry dated 9-5-12 Judge/Clerk - Note was emailed to atty. Pickett. |
|
September 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 09/05/2012; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Cause continued to 10/3/12 at 9:00 a.m. all as per Judge John Moody. |
|
September 05, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/03/2012 - Other Final Disposition \n Scheduled For: 10/03/2012; 9:00 AM ; JOHN G MOODY; Ozark |
|
August 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the docket entry dated 8-8-12 Judge/Clerk - Note was emailed to atty. Pickett. |
|
August 08, 2012 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 08/08/2012; 9:00 AM Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.