Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital Region Medical Center, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Shoener , Jonathan L, against Bizzle , Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Osage County, MO, . Osage County, MO Superior Courts MO-Osage County with BRANDT, SONYA DAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDT, SONYA DAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2020 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsage County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Osage County |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: December 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal Filed | |
January 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
Voluntary Dismissal Filed VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, filed. vw Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: CAPITAL REGION MEDICAL CENTER |
|
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Filing: | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing: A Payment of -$52.00 was made on receipt 20OS54934. Refund of overpayment of Court costs. vw |
|
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Copy of the Judgment mailed to the Defendant. vw |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered JUDGMENT It is Ordered that Plaintiff is awarded judgment against Defendant $524.66 Count I, $985.08 Count II, for a total of $1,509.74 plus cour costs. /s/ Judge Sonya D. Brandt vw |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
December 01, 2020 | Hearing | Consent Judgment | |
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Consent Judgment Judgment entered. /s/ Judge Sonya D. Brandt vw Associated Entries: 11/13/2020 - Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/10/2020; 9:00 AM ; SONYA DAY BRANDT; Osage County |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.