Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Light , B Jack, filed a(n) Ac Misc Associate Civil-Other case against Roberts , Lance L., in the jurisdiction of Osage County, MO, . Osage County, MO Superior Courts MO-Osage County with BRANDT, SONYA DAY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRANDT, SONYA DAY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2020 |
CategoryAc Misc Associate Civil-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsage County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Osage County |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Judgment Entered
Date: October 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered. vw Filed By: B JACK LIGHT |
|
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed INTERROGATORIES TO GARNISHEE, filed. Garnishment/Execution Number 21-GARN-186 vw |
|
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Garnishment Returned Served | |
March 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Returned Served Document ID - 21-GARN-186; Served To - JIM BUTLER CHEVROLET - LINN; Server - SO OSAGE COUNTY - LINN; Served Date - 09-MAR-21; Served Time - 07:50:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Execution/Garnishment Issued | |
February 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued Garnishment given to the Osage Co Sheriff's Dept for service. This is garnishment 21-GARN-186 for LANCE L. ROBERTS; returnable date: 13-JUL-2048; Garnishee: JIM BUTLER CHEVROLET - LINN |
|
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Filing: | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Filing: CORRESPONDENCE from Defendant filed. vw Filed By: LANCE L. ROBERTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.