Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Hughes , Piper Lori, against Parker , Stacie L, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, MO, . Lincoln County, MO Superior Courts MO-LINCOLN COUNTY with ALLSBERRY, GREGORY K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2019 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLincoln County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-LINCOLN COUNTY |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS PER MEMO, FOR THE SUM OF $831.62 WITH INTEREST AT 9% PER ANNUM AND COURT COST. JUDGMENT MAILED TO DFT 2-3-2020 |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Court Trial Held | |
January 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Held Scheduled For: 01/29/2020; 2:30 PM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Court Trial Scheduled | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Filed | |
December 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Trial Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/29/2020 - Court Trial Held \n Scheduled For: 01/29/2020; 2:30 PM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Review Held | |
December 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Review Held Scheduled For: 11/27/2019; 1:30 PM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.