Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sherwin Williams Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Speier , Rebecca Leigh, against Otte , Larry, Pro Basement Inc, represented by Risch , Nathan John, in the jurisdiction of Lincoln County, MO, . Lincoln County, MO Superior Courts MO-LINCOLN COUNTY with ALLSBERRY, GREGORY K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 18, 2017 |
CategoryAc Contract-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLincoln County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-LINCOLN COUNTY |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed By Parties |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Dismissed by Parties | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Review Held Scheduled For: 06/26/2019; 1:30 PM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
January 22, 2019 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 01/22/2019; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Associated Entries: 07/02/2019 - Case Review Held \n Scheduled For: 06/26/2019; 1:30 PM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Associated Entries: 01/22/2019 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 01/22/2019; 9:00 AM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
December 11, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 12/11/2018; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Associated Entries: 12/11/2018 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Scheduled For: 12/11/2018; 9:00 AM ; GREGORY K. ALLSBERRY; LINCOLN COUNTY |
|
November 13, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 11/13/2018; 9:00 AM Case Review |
|
October 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/02/2018; 9:00 AM Case Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.