Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
World Acceptance Corporation Of Missouri D B A World Finance, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gamache , David Reid, against King , Sharon L, in the jurisdiction of Lafayette County, MO, . Lafayette County, MO Superior Courts MO-Lafayette with ROSE, KELLY ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2018 |
CategoryAc Breach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLafayette County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Lafayette |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Plaintiff appears by attorney Deborah Greco on behalf of David Gamache. Defendant never served. Court on it's own dismisses cause of action without prejudice. Associated Entries: 08/20/2018 - Hearing Continued/Rescheduled \n Associated Entries: 08/20/2018 - Dismissal Hearing Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 10/04/2018; 9:00 AM ; KELLY ANN ROSE; Lafayette Hall |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note The Court, on its on Motion sets this matter for dismissal on October 4, 2018 at 9:00 am. Request for an alias summons must be received by the Court 5 days prior to the dismissal hearing date, or cause will be dismissed. Notice of Entry issued. |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Returned Non-Est Document ID - 18-ADSM-629; Served To - ; Server - SO LAFAYETTE COUNTY-LEXINGTON; Served Date - 19-AUG-18; Served Time - 17:45:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Non-est; Service Text - Non Est, does not live at this address |
|
August 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Dismissal Hearing Scheduled Associated Entries: 10/04/2018 - Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Plaintiff appears by attorney Deborah Greco on behalf of David Gamache. Defendant never served. Court on it's own dismisses cause of action without prejudice. \n Scheduled For: 10/04/2018; 9:00 AM ; KELLY ANN ROSE; Lafayette Hall |
|
August 20, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Hearing Continued From: 10/04/2018; 9:00 AM Hearing |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Associate Document ID: 18-ADSM-629, for KING, SHARON L. |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge Assigned | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Filing Info Sheet eFiling Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pet Filed in Associate Ct PETITION. Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE \n On Behalf Of: WORLD ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION OF MISSOURI D/B/A WORLD FINANCE |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Note to Clerk eFiling Filed By: DAVID REID GAMACHE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.