Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jp Morgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Jaros , Elliott Clayton, against Doe , John, Randle , Phillip E., in the jurisdiction of Lafayette County, MO, . Lafayette County, MO Superior Courts MO-Lafayette with ROSE, KELLY ANN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 09, 2015 |
CategoryAc Unlawful Detainer |
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLafayette County, MO |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Filing Court HouseMO-Lafayette |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: August 20, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Return Service-Writ Non-Est Writ of Execution in Unlawful Detainer's Action for Possession is returned by the Lafayette County Sheriff showing non est, return to court per attorney's office. |
|
September 30, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution/Garnishment | |
September 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
Request for Execution/Garnish Plaintiff files Request for Writ of Execution/Possession. Filed By: ELLIOTT CLAYTON JAROS \n On Behalf Of: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Court enters judgment against defendants for possession of premises located at 312 S 27th St, Lexington, MO 64067. Execution stayed until 9-4-2015. (See Judgment) |
|
August 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Hearing Held Plaintiff appears by attorney Elliott Jaros. Defendant appears in person and consents to judgment. Scheduled For: 08/20/2015; 9:00 AM ; KELLY ANN ROSE; Lafayette Hall |
|
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Consent Judgment | |
August 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 15-SOUD-34; Served To - DOE, JOHN; Server - SO LAFAYETTE COUNTY-LEXINGTON; Served Date - 05-AUG-15; Served Time - 12:25:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served; Service Text - Leaving with Phillip Randle. |
|
August 07, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 15-SOUD-35; Served To - RANDLE, PHILLIP E.; Server - SO LAFAYETTE COUNTY-LEXINGTON; Served Date - 05-AUG-15; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 15-SOUD-35, for RANDLE, PHILLIP E.. |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued-Unlawful Detain Document ID: 15-SOUD-34, for DOE, JOHN. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.