Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aldridge , Virginia Lynn filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 17, 2018 |
CategoryCc Adult Abuse W/O Stalking |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeTried By Court-Civil |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Review Held | |
June 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Held Scheduled For: 06/12/2018; 1:00 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Review Scheduled | |
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled Court date given to parties on Full Order of Protection. Associated Entries: 06/12/2018 - Case Review Held \n Scheduled For: 06/12/2018; 1:00 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Ord of Protection Served | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ord of Protection Served Document ID - 18-AFOP-5; Served To - ALDRIDGE, VIRGINIA LYNN; Server - SO KNOX COUNTY-EDINA; Served Date - 22-MAY-18; Served Time - 12:35:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Full Order of Protection | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Adult Abuse Hearing Held | |
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event | JFULL Submitted Electronically |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.