Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kirksville Missouri Hospital Company, L.L.C., filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Shoener , Jonathan L, against Phelps , Brad, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2017 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: December 08, 2017Judgment Entered
Date: December 04, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Judge/Clerk - Note | |
January 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note A file stamped copy of the Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
January 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
January 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, L.L.C. |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry along with a copy of the Release of Garnishment mailed to Defendant and Pechosh Landscaping. Associated Entries: 12/04/2017 - Judgment Entered See written Judgment Filed; \n Associated Entries: 12/08/2017 - Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court |
|
October 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 20-GARN-266 |
|
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Release Filed | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Release Filed RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, L.L.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.