Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Capital One Bank Na, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tucker , Adam David, against Mckay , James B, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2017 |
CategoryAc Contract/Account (Bulk) |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: November 28, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: SEAN MCELWAIN \n On Behalf Of: CAPITAL ONE BANK NA \n Associated Entries: 11/28/2017 - Judgment Entered Default Judgment |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry along with a copy of Satisfaction mailed to James B. McKay. | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
November 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed a filed stamped copy of Judgment to Defendant on 11/29/17 |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Default Judgment Filed By: JAMES B MCKAY \n Associated Entries: 02/19/2020 - Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Judgment Entered | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing Held | |
November 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.