Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Martin , Amy Jo, filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail-Undeliverable Mail Returne Undeliverable to Jazzeeka Booker |
|
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge/Clerk - Note Ck #16952 for payment of balance on GAL Fees mailed to Philip McIntosh |
|
October 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order "As the remaining GAL fees are uncollectible, the Clerk is to submit the remaining fees owed to Knox County for payment. TPR" Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt 02KN16143. |
|
October 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 10/09/2018; 1:33 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt 02KN15940. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed A Payment of -$25.00 was made on receipt 02KN15780. |
|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Payment Review Hrng Scheduled For Courts Review Associated Entries: 10/09/2018 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 10/09/2018; 1:33 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
March 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed A Payment of -$20.00 was made on receipt 02KN15550. |
|
February 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Receipt Filed A Payment of -$30.00 was made on receipt 02KN15527. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.