Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Miller , Karen, Miller , Victor, filed a(n) case represented by Silvernail , Leslie Jo, against Miller , Leanne A, Miller , Jonathan V, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts with STEELE, RUSSELL ELLIS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissed by Parties Plaintiffs by Atty Anderson. Petition voluntarily dismissed w/o prejudice. RES Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Associated Entries: 03/13/2018 - Trial Setting Scheduled \n Scheduled For: 04/06/2018; 9:00 AM ; RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE; Knox |
|
March 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Note that the day of Trial Setting has been changed from April 5, 2018 at 9:00 am to April 6, 2018 at 9:00 am. Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Scheduled Associated Entries: 03/13/2018 - Notice Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. \n Associated Entries: 04/06/2018 - Dismissed by Parties Plaintiffs by Atty Anderson. Petition voluntarily dismissed w/o prejudice. RES Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. \n Scheduled For: 04/06/2018; 9:00 AM ; RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE; Knox |
|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Associated Entries: 03/09/2018 - Case Review Held 3-9-2018 Parties fail to appear for status review. Case continued to April 6, 2-18, at 9:00 a.m. for trial setting. /s/ Russell E. Steele \n Associated Entries: 03/13/2018 - Trial Setting Scheduled |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Held 3-9-2018 Parties fail to appear for status review. Case continued to April 6, 2-18, at 9:00 a.m. for trial setting. /s/ Russell E. Steele Filed By: RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE \n Scheduled For: 03/09/2018; 9:00 AM ; RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE; Knox |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order This case is set for status review on March 9, 2018, at 9:00 a.m. /s/ Russell E. Steele Filed By: RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Review Scheduled For Status Review. Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Associated Entries: 03/09/2018 - Case Review Held 3-9-2018 Parties fail to appear for status review. Case continued to April 6, 2-18, at 9:00 a.m. for trial setting. /s/ Russell E. Steele \n Scheduled For: 03/09/2018; 9:00 AM ; RUSSELL ELLIS STEELE; Knox |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Summons Personally Served Document ID - 16-SMOS-12; Served To - MILLER, LEANNE A; Server - ; Served Date - 18-JAN-17; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Family Member/Roommate Served Document ID - 16-SMOS-13; Served To - MILLER, JONATHAN V; Server - ; Served Date - 18-JAN-17; Served Time - 00:00:00; Service Type - Sheriff Department; Reason Description - Served |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Service Service of Summons. Filed By: LESLIE JO SILVERNAIL \n On Behalf Of: VICTOR MILLER, KAREN MILLER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.