Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lay , Joshua C, filed a(n) Cc Dl Revoc Rvw 302.311 Rsmo case represented by Cruse , Fredrich J, against Missouri Department Of Revenue Driver License Bureau, represented by Cox , Joseph Mark, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 12, 2016 |
CategoryCc Dl Revoc Rvw 302.311 Rsmo |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeDismiss By Ct W/O Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion Granted/Sustained | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Hearing/Trial Cancelled | |
March 13, 2017 | Hearing |
Hearing/Trial Cancelled Scheduled For: 02/28/2017; 1:30 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Granted/Sustained "Cause dismissed. TPR" Filed By: THOMAS P. REDINGTON \n Associated Entries: 02/24/2017 - Motion to Dismiss Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Dismiss by Ct w/o Prejudice Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: FREDRICH J CRUSE \n On Behalf Of: JOSHUA C LAY \n Associated Entries: 03/13/2017 - Motion Granted/Sustained "Cause dismissed. TPR" |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing Scheduled | |
December 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Counsel of Record Notified Via Missouri Courts Electronic Filing System. Associated Entries: 03/13/2017 - Hearing/Trial Cancelled \n Scheduled For: 02/28/2017; 1:30 PM ; THOMAS P. REDINGTON; Knox |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.