Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kirksville Missouri Hospital Co, Llc, filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case represented by Shoener , Jonathan L, against Ward , Merry Carlene, in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2016 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeConsent Judgment |
Judgment Entered
Date: March 17, 2016Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: April 05, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Garn Release/Return/Recall | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Full Release of Garnishment | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Garn Release/Return/Recall Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 16-GARN-266 |
|
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Full Release of Garnishment RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL CO, LLC |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Correspondence Sent | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment Filed | |
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Sent Notice of Entry mailed to Defendant with a copy of Satisfaction attached. |
|
June 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL CO, LLC \n Associated Entries: 03/17/2016 - Judgment Entered Per written Judgment filed. \n Associated Entries: 04/05/2016 - Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court |
|
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed | |
May 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Stmnt Judmt Balance Filed STATEMENT OF JUDGMENT BALANCE; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Total Unsatisfied Judgment Balance: $628.88 Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL CO, LLC \n Associated Entries: 05/20/2016 - Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 16-GARN-266 for MERRY CARLENE WARD; returnable date: Continuous Wage Garnishment; Garnishee: KNOX COUNTY NURSING HOME |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.