Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Ac Suit On Account case in the jurisdiction of Knox County, MO, . Knox County, MO Superior Courts MO-Knox with REDINGTON, THOMAS P. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2014 |
CategoryAc Suit On Account |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationKnox County, MO |
|
Filing Court HouseMO-Knox |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court
Date: February 25, 2015Judgment Entered
Date: January 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Filed Satisfaction of Judgment; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER |
|
October 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release Filed Release on Garnishment/Execution Number 15-GARN-173 |
|
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
Release Filed RELEASE OF GARNISHMENT; Electronic Filing Certificate of Service. Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER \n On Behalf Of: KIRKSVILLE MISSOURI HOSPITAL COMPANY, L.L.C. |
|
August 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Ansrs to Interrogatories Filed Garnishment/Execution Number 15-GARN-173 |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Interrogatories Filed Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Garnishment Requested Filed By: JAMES JOSEPH EUFINGER |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
Execution/Garnishment Issued This is garnishment 15-GARN-173 for VIRGINIA M POTTER; returnable date: 19-OCT-2015; Garnishee: TWIN PINES ADULT CARE CENTER: E/G WITH INTERROGATORIES AND CHECK FOR SERVICE FEE MAILED TO ADAIR CO. SHERIFF'S DEPT. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Jgmt Transcribed Circuit Court Cert. copy of Transcript Judgment mailed to APLT. |
|
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
Req for Transcript Judgment Filed By: JONATHAN L SHOENER |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Copy of Judgment handed to local counsel for APLT in open court. Copy of Judgment mailed to DFTs. Filed By: CLYDE DAVID POTTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.